House | 06/08/2023 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 85, nays 12. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2023. | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/05/2023 | Reported with amendments (10-0-1). | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |