Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR67 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

                            ENROLLED
2023 Regular Session
HOUSE RESOLUTION NO. 67
BY REPRESENTATIVE AMEDEE
A RESOLUTION
To posthumously commend Glenn Henri Daigle for his military service.
WHEREAS, Glenn Henri Daigle was born on October 7, 1939, in Labadieville,
Louisiana, and served in the United States Navy during the Vietnam War; and
WHEREAS, Glenn entered the Naval Aviation Cadet Program on August 24, 1962,
after attending Louisiana State University; he was commissioned an ensign in the U.S. Navy
on January 1, 1963, and received his Naval Flight Officer Wings in July 1963; during that
period, he also completed his undergraduate studies and received a bachelor's degree from
LSU in May 1963; and
WHEREAS, while serving in North Vietnam, then-Lieutenant Junior Grade Daigle
was shot down and captured as a prisoner of war; over the next seven years, he endured
extreme mental and physical cruelties while resisting attempts to obtain military information
and false confessions; he was released on February 12, 1973; and
WHEREAS, Glenn retired from the U.S. Navy in 1982 having achieved the rank of
commander; he was also awarded the Silver Star; his Silver Star citation read in part:  "For
conspicuous gallantry and intrepidity while interned as a Prisoner of War in North Vietnam
... By his determination, courage, resourcefulness, and devotion to duty, he reflected great
credit upon himself and upheld the highest traditions of the Naval Services and the United
States Armed Forces."; and
WHEREAS, Mr. Daigle happily spent the rest of his days with his wife, Elizabeth,
in Texas, and passed away on December 1, 2022; and
Page 1 of 2 HR NO. 67	ENROLLED
WHEREAS, Glenn Henri Daigle is a true American hero whose mental and physical
fortitude in the face of unthinkable conditions as a prisoner of war warrants the highest
recognition.
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the
Legislature of Louisiana does hereby posthumously commend Glenn Henri Daigle for his
military service and does hereby express a sincere measure of gratitude for his incredible
strength, patriotism, and selflessness.
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Page 2 of 2