House | 05/17/2023 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 86, nays 1. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/2023. | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported favorably (11-0-1). | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |