Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 5/16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|