Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported with amendments (8-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|