Senate | 05/31/2023 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |