Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Effective date 8/1/2023.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 207.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|