House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Cloud, White, and Boudreaux.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Edmonds, Zeringue, and Turner.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|