Senate | 05/16/2023 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 12 yeas and 26 nays. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |