House
|
05/31/2023
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 52, nays 45. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported with amendments (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|