Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 333.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Geymann, Huval, and Pressly.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Stine, Talbot, and Bernard.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|