Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 8 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 55, nays 28. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Reported with amendments (8-5-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 12 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|