House | 05/24/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |