Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Effective date 8/1/2023.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 393.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Hewitt, Milligan, and Price.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Newell, Stefanski, and Gregory Miller.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|