House | 05/10/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |