Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Effective date 6/28/2023.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 435.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice the House discharged the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Discharged from Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice Senate discharged the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee members discharged.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Bishop, Schexnayder, and Beaullieu.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Allain, Connick, and Reese.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|