Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Effective date 8/1/2023.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 437.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 3 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 70, nays 27. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Edmonston, Bishop, and Hodges.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Mizell, Boudreaux, and Allain.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 21. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 31 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
By a vote of 86 yeas, 8 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2023
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Reported with amendments (19-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported favorably (12-3). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|