Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Effective date 8/1/2023.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 188.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|