Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 321.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/08/2023.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Gadberry, Wright, and Gregory Miller.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Pope, McMath, and Smith.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|