Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Effective date 6/7/2023.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 149.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|