Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Effective date 7/1/2023.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 38.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported with amendments (9-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|