House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
By a vote of 93 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2023
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2023
|
Reported favorably (9-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|