Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 67 yeas, 29 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 27 yeas and 10 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|