Senate | 05/04/2023 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |