Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 96 yeas, 1 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported favorably (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|