Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 19. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
By a vote of 85 yeas, 17 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Reported with amendments (21-3).
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re-engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|