Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 99 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Reported without amendments (8-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported with amendments (8-0-1) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|