Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Reported favorably (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|