Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 104 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported favorably (10-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported with amendments (9-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|