Senate | 06/08/2023 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Read by title and adopted. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |