LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR5
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SR5
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2023 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR5
Action History
Senate
05/04/2023
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Senate
04/26/2023
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted.
Senate
04/25/2023
Reported with amendments.
Senate
04/11/2023
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Senate
04/10/2023
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.