Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 27 yeas and 11 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 16. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 01/19/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Reported with amendments (14-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 11 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|