House
|
03/05/2024
|
Effective date: 04/29/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 7.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 12 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2024
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 32. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/23/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported with amendments (9-5). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/9/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|