Senate | 02/26/2024 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2024 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 6. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/23/2024. | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Reported favorably (16-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |