House
|
03/05/2024
|
Effective date: 04/29/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 12.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 71, nays 27, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 02/29/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2024
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/23/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported with amendments (10-3-1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|