House
|
03/05/2024
|
Effective date: 08/1/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 73, nays 27, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/22/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Reported with amendments (8-6).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/9/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|