Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Effective date 3/5/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 104, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/28/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|