House
|
12/04/2024
|
Effective date: 12/04/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 11.
|
|
|
House
|
11/25/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2024
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 80, nays 19. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2024
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2024
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/19/2024
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2024
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 23. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 11/14/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Reported favorably (18-4).
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Reported with amendments (16-2). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2024
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
11/04/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
11/04/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|