House | 11/20/2024 | Notice removed | ||
House | 11/20/2024 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 11/20/2024 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 11/19/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 11/20/2024. | ||
House | 11/19/2024 | Notice given. | ||
House | 11/18/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 11/19/2024. | ||
House | 11/18/2024 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 11/14/2024. | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Reported favorably (17-6). | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Reported with amendments (16-2). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 11/06/2024 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 11/04/2024 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 11/04/2024 | Prefiled. |