Senate
|
11/25/2024
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/25/2024
|
Becomes Act No. 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2024
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 11/25/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 11/25/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2024
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 28 yeas and 10 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2024
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 25. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
11/21/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 11/22/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2024
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
Reported without amendments (11-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
11/18/2024
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
11/18/2024
|
Reported favorably (7-6). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2024
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 7 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2024
|
Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2024
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2024
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|