Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|