House
|
06/25/2024
|
Effective date: 08/01/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2024
|
Becomes Act No. 782 without the Governor's signature.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 19. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported with amendments (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|