House | 04/10/2024 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/2024. | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/09/2024. | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Reported with amendments (11-0). | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Prefiled. |