Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 13 yeas and 21 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 35. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported favorably (14-3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Discharged from the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|