House
|
06/03/2024
|
Effective date: 07/01/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 423.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 18. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/25/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported with amendments (13-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|