Senate | 03/26/2024 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 17. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/21/2024. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Reported with amendments (11-4-1). | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Prefiled. |