House | 03/21/2024 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/21/2024. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Prefiled. |