Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 10 yeas and 25 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 29. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/25/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported favorably (8-2-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|