House
|
06/10/2024
|
Effective date: 08/01/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 558.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 85, nays 3. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 5. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/27/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|