House
|
06/19/2024
|
Effective date: 07/01/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 673.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2024
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Carter, Price, and Talbot.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Bacala, Firment, and Illg.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/23/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported with amendments (8-2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|